THE OAK AND FURROWS WILDLIFE RESCUE CENTRE

Charity number: 1177380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To care for all injured and orphaned wildlife in Gloucestershire band North Wiltshire. Education of the public to the needs of wildlife and visits with talks to schools and clubs in our area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £83,935
Total expenditure: £50,121

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire
  • Oxfordshire
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 March 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher James Laurence OBE QVRM Trustee 20 March 2020
Royal Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals North Wiltshire and Newbury District Branch
Received: On time
ANIMAL BEHAVIOUR TRAINING COUNCIL
Received: On time
BRITISH VETERINARY BEHAVIOUR ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH WILTSHIRE AND NEWBURY DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
OXFORDSHIRE YEOMANRY TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LONDON SOUTH EAST BRANCH
TYTHERTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
ANNE MURRAY Trustee 20 March 2020
Royal Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals North Wiltshire and Newbury District Branch
Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH WILTSHIRE AND NEWBURY DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Michelle Bowyer BA Trustee 21 February 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH WILTSHIRE AND NEWBURY DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Royal Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals North Wiltshire and Newbury District Branch
Received: On time
LINDA WINONA POPE Trustee 01 November 2016
None on record
STUART JOHN FORREST Trustee 30 June 2010
THE CIRENCESTER INDEPENDENT ASSOCIATION FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £133.68k £278.60k £212.82k £98.60k £83.94k
Total expenditure £232.42k £385.19k £15.43k £279.57k £50.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Oak and Furrows
Unit 6
Clearwater Business Park
Frankland Road
Blagrove
Phone:
01793 640136