SPECIAL FRIENDS

Charity Number: 1179301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Special Friends support families living in Belper and the neighbouring areas who have children with additional needs and disabilities. The whole family is supported through; Playgroup, Siblings support, Family Activities, Accessible activities for SEN children, Social events, Information Workshops and Parent/Carer Support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,924
Total expenditure: £2,059

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 July 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LUCY SARNA Chair 11 October 2017
None on record
Hayley Guest Trustee 22 September 2024
None on record
SARAH LOUISE JOHNSON Trustee 11 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.21k £2.34k £3.55k £1.34k £3.92k
Total expenditure £3.68k £2.76k £3.23k £2.16k £2.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
185 SANDBED LANE
BELPER
DE56 0SL
Phone:
01773824145