BUCKS ANIMAL RESCUE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote humane behaviour towards animals by providing appropriate care, protection, treatment, security and re-homing for animals which are in need of care and attention by reason of sickness, maltreatment, poor circumstances or ill usage and to educate the public in matters pertaining to animal welfare in general and the prevention of cruelty and suffering among animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD POTYKA | Chair | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Rosser | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Green | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.89k | £8.24k | £14.89k | £19.67k | £16.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.89k | £8.24k | £14.89k | £19.67k | £16.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 10 February 2023 | 409 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 10 February 2023 | 409 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 10 February 2023 | 773 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 10 February 2023 | 773 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT, SECURITY AND RE-HOMING FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLAYFIELD HOUSE
WHITEPIT LANE
WOOBURN GREEN
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP10 0HR
- Phone:
- 01628528181
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window