INSTITUTE FOR THE FUTURE OF WORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Institute for the Future of Work is an independent charity with a mission to shape a future in which work is better and fairer. We seek out the most pressing challenges - and seize opportunities - to (i) advance education into changes to the world of work and (ii) prevent and relieve in-work poverty through the Fourth Industrial Revolution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£880,061
Donations and legacies | £846.69k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £33.37k |
Total expenditure:
£929,711
Raising funds | £600 | |
Charitable activities | £929.11k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £600 | |
Charitable expenditure | £929.11k |
People

7 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 November 2018: Standard registration
- THE FUTURE OF WORK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANNE-MARIE OSAMWENZE IMAFIDON | Chair | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sana Khareghani | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gina Sue Neff | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUE BLACK | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|||||
DANIELA BARONE SOARES | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Martha Elizabeth Dalton | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOFOROS ANTONIOU PISSARIDES | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME JOHN NUTTALL | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Wendy Climer CBE FREng | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.83k | £350.35k | £820.58k | £880.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.83k | £290.46k | £659.70k | £929.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £813.08k | £846.69k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £7.50k | £33.37k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £657.75k | £929.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £1.95k | £600 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.04k | £3.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £5.26k | £5.11k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £368.55k | £383.10k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £73.89k | £137.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INTO CHANGES TO THE WORLD OF WORK WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REGARD TO THE IMPACT OF TECHNOLOGY ON WORK AND SOCIETY; (B) PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY IN THE CONTEXT OF THE IMPACT OF TECHNOLOGY ON WORK AND SOCIETY WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REGARD TO THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND (C) ADVANCE ANY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE BY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, (I) RESEARCH AND POLICY DEVELOPMENT; (II) THE DEVELOPMENT AND TESTING OF NEW AND IMPROVED WAYS OF WORKING AND SUPPORT FOR WORK; (III) RECOMMENDATIONS ON IMPROVING ALL ASPECTS OF WORK; AND (III) ADVOCACY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Field Fisher
Riverbank House
2 Swan Lane
LONDON
EC4R 3TT
- Phone:
- 0203 701 7633
- Email:
- team@ifow.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window