SOUTH SHORE COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The South Shore Community Partnership run and administer a Community facility known as The Hub @ South Shore for the benefit of all members of the community. They do this by offering a wide range of classes, courses and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £57,215 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackpool
Governance
- 20 November 2018: Standard registration
- 14 January 2022: Funds received from 1125875 FRIENDS OF HIGHFIELD ROAD PARK
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GWENDOLINE MARGARET KING | Chair | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ellis | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Frances Eccleston | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Gardner | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN COOPE | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.38k | £13.07k | £55.86k | £89.17k | £154.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.59k | £44.36k | £36.62k | £82.33k | £107.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.49k | £57.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE FYLDE COAST, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 HERON WAY
BLACKPOOL
FY3 8FB
- Phone:
- 07917004653
- Email:
- office@sscp.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window