CYLCH MEITHRIN YR ENFYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cylch Meirthin yr Enfys are a Welsh Language nursery setting providing pre-school and early years education to children between the ages of 2 and 4.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £33,341 from 12 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Caerphilly
Governance
- 19 March 2018: CIO registration
- 24 October 2018: Funds received from 1086703 CYLCH MEITHRIN YR ENFYS
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynwen John | Chair | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNA MARIE WEBB | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Lois Mair Roberts | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.46k | £56.03k | £59.61k | £58.42k | £48.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.65k | £38.86k | £62.58k | £57.08k | £57.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.38k | £36.32k | £42.80k | £41.73k | £33.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN CYLCH MEITHRIN YR ENFYS THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ystrad Mynach Boys & Girls Club
Lisburn Road
Ystrad Mynach
HENGOED
CF82 7AS
- Phone:
- 07903 368454
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window