BEAUFORT MALE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The choir practises and performs choral music and raises money for charities by singing at concerts and other such events mainly in SE Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blaenau Gwent
Governance
- 17 August 1981: Standard registration
- THE BEAUFORT MALE CHOIR (Working name)
- BEAUFORT MALE VOICE CHOIR (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ivan Frank Langford | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Owen Cole Jones | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lewis Powell | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leonardus Theodorus Maria Prop | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Alan Harrhy | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John Christopher EVANS | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mark Williams | Trustee | 27 September 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.59k | £17.57k | £12.85k | £22.73k | £34.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.22k | £14.38k | £13.86k | £18.51k | £32.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £400 | £10.20k | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JULY 1981, AS AMENDED 29 JANUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES, MAINLY FOR CHARITIES, AND BY THE PRESENTATION OF AN ANNUAL CONCERT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Sarno Square
ABERGAVENNY
NP7 5JT
- Phone:
- 01873857875
- Email:
- chris.evans1@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window