SKY CREATIVE SUSSEX
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sky Creative Sussex is an award-winning Arts and Education charity that champions eco-awareness and inclusivity above all! We achieve our goals of spreading awareness of these issues by delivering workshops to disadvantaged individuals through the accessible lens of Fantasy and Science Fiction. With a hands-on learning approach we provide a welcoming environment to inspire creativity and
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- WYNTERCON (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.77k | £15.97k | £39.37k | £16.57k | £10.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.95k | £13.45k | £28.90k | £15.50k | £21.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 24 APR 2018 AMENDED ON 22 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF COMMUNITIES IN ENGLAND BY PROVIDING WORKSHOPS AND COURSES THAT: A) PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH; B) ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE RECLAMATION, RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS; B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF WASTE GENERATION, WASTE MANAGEMENT AND WASTE RECYCLING. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window