3 ARMOURED CLOSE SUPPORT BATTALION ROYAL ELECTRICAL AND MECHANICAL ENGINEERS PRESIDENT OF THE REGIMENTAL INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Army Sgts Mess, Army Officers Mess, Army PRI
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Macklin | Trustee | 06 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.74k | £32.29k | £32.29k | £31.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.83k | £44.27k | £44.27k | £40.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 222 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT IS THE PROMOTION OF EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN. IT DOES THIS BY PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF SOCIAL, SPORTING AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF PERSONNEL SERVING WITH 3 ARMD CS BN REME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jellalabad Barracks
TIDWORTH
SP9 7BQ
- Phone:
- 01980656379
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window