Accounts and annual returns GOHIL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178935
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 14 October 2024 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 14 October 2024 167 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 03 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 03 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 August 2021 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 03 August 2021 95 days late Download Open in new window