COLNAGHI FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1178872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the public in the appreciation of fine and decorative arts, in particular Old Master works of art in the UK and abroad

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £91,455
Total expenditure: £106,721

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Austria
  • Belgium
  • France
  • Germany
  • Italy
  • Netherlands
  • Portugal
  • Spain

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zanete Bukarte Trustee 25 October 2024
None on record
Raphael Wertheimer Trustee 05 January 2024
None on record
Karien Whitley Trustee 04 December 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £232.63k £232.63k £15.68k £340.93k £91.46k
Total expenditure £240.43k £240.43k £233.19k £74.87k £106.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 January 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 January 2024 70 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 February 2023 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 June 2021 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 June 2021 229 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
26 Bury Street
St James's
London
SW1Y 6AL
Phone:
02074917408
Email:
No information available