Financial history RIAZ UL KARAM

Charity Number: 1179632
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £31.17k £111.85k £90.04k £73.76k £50.18k
Total expenditure £26.08k £119.71k £90.10k £73.73k £46.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A