BRIGHTLINGSEA LIDO

Charity number: 1178539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Brightlingsea Lido is an historic outdoor swimming pool providing seasonal recreational facilities to the people of Brightlingsea, the surrounding area and to the general public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £176,959
Total expenditure: £182,423

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 May 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Brian Lambert Trustee 14 December 2023
YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION BRIGHTLINGSEA BRANCH
Received: On time
Gillian Joan Clegg Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Celia Jones Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Stephen Watts Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Neil Ballard Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
DAVID ATKINSON Trustee 29 May 2018
None on record
JENNIFER BARRY Trustee 29 May 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £259.06k £63.09k £182.94k £258.75k £176.96k
Total expenditure £260.58k £30.80k £180.25k £187.23k £182.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £46.25k £42.55k N/A £3.56k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Brightlingsea Lido
Promenade Way
Brightlingsea
COLCHESTER
CO7 0HH
Phone:
01206303067