Accounts and annual returns MEN CAVE

Charity number: 1179273
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 February 2025 378 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 February 2025 378 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 July 2022 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 July 2022 158 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 March 2022 422 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 July 2022 523 days late Download Open in new window