ALVELEY PARISH MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall. Provides facilities for village organisations, eg. amateur drama group, indoor bowling, Art Group, Village Band rehearsals, functions and social events such as birthday parties, concerts, barn dances. Used as Council and General election centre and venue for public meetings. The hall is also a promoter for Arts Alive shows.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2025
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 09 September 1981: Standard registration
- ALVELEY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faith Dyche | Trustee | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diane Elizabeth Knowles | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kelig Renee Dampure | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Graham | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Reginald Portsmouth | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Alex Dodd | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Taylor | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS THOMPSON | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAMES THOMPSON | Trustee | 04 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Stella Voysey | Trustee | 17 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Milena Styles | Trustee | 20 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
TONY HEAD | Trustee | 16 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ARMITAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
F DAVID VOYSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH DAWES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | 31/01/2025 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.53k | £24.40k | £8.77k | £10.00k | £9.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.87k | £12.02k | £7.81k | £12.22k | £11.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2025 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2025 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 OCTOBER 1971 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 JANUARY 2011.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ALVELEY IN THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETING LECTURES ANDCLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ALVELEY, SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 BRIDGE ROAD
ALVELEY
BRIDGNORTH
WV15 6JP
- Phone:
- 01746780478
- Email:
- alveleyvillagehall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window