PHOENIX COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Phoenix Counselling Service (PCS) is a Charitable Incorporated Organisation providing a low cost counselling service which aims to provide professional counselling for adults in Burntwood, Lichfield and the surrounding area who do not meet the criteria for 1-to-1 CBT or counselling via the Psychological Wellbeing Service (PWBS), or other NHS provision, and who cannot afford private counselling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £16,255 from 10 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 02 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
erica Knight | Chair | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Share | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Pauline Wright | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Pipe | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Wharton MB,CHB | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR GEOFF GOODYEAR | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.38k | £20.14k | £26.04k | £34.32k | £34.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.57k | £16.75k | £23.73k | £20.20k | £26.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.55k | £11.50k | £11.78k | £16.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THE PUBLIC AND PREDOMINATELY PEOPLE AGED 18 AND OVER IN BURNTWOOD, LICHFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF A SAFE AND AFFORDABLE COUNSELLING SERVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Footherley Road
Shenstone
Lichfield
WS14 0NJ
- Phone:
- 07415517663
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window