Financial history MOINEST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1177217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £24.21k £24.61k £25.25k £26.89k £30.43k
Total expenditure £9.75k £8.69k £16.66k £18.38k £20.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A