SPORTS ALIVE NORTH WEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth work Detached work Healthy lifestyles Project work Sports and coaching
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £93,265 from 13 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
Governance
- 01 August 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Cosgrove | Chair | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN MCCOY | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
LIANNE MCGINNES | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|||||
ROSEMARY PHILOMENA HUDSON | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £267.91k | £360.41k | £296.05k | £392.93k | £364.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.36k | £225.34k | £271.01k | £311.94k | £354.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £150.00k | £200.00k | £200.00k | £62.75k | £93.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MERSEYSIDE AND THE NORTH WEST AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE:- (1) ORGANISATION OF SPORTS COACHING SESSIONS IN SCHOOLS, YOUTH CENTRES AND COMMUNITY CENTRES; (2) FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR RECREATIONAL, SPORTING OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AND SERVICES; (3) THE IMPROVEMENT AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION; (4) EDUCATION, TRAINING AND COACHING COURSES WHICH PROMOTE PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ADLAM PARK ACTIVITY CENTRE
ADLAM ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L10 1LG
- Phone:
- 07754113557
- Email:
- admin@sports-alive.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window