Accounts and annual returns AUTASTIC

Charity number: 1180325
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 March 2025 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 05 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 05 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 08 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window