AUTASTIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF FAMILIES AFFECTED BY SPECIAL EDUCATION NEEDS LIVING IN GREATER MANCHESTER IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. TO HOLD DANCE SESSIONS/ ACTIVITY DAYS TO ENABLE OTHERS TO COMMUNICATE AND FEEL A SENSE OF COMMUNITY. TO SUPPORT THE CHILDRENS EDUCATIONAL NEEDS VIA CHILDCARE SERVICE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Jane Mc Cann | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Azuka Achi Otutu | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.05k | £37 | £13.13k | £12.94k | £28.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.83k | £9.77k | £12.31k | £10.17k | £6.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2024
(These accounts |
14 March 2025 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF FAMILIES AFFECTED BY SPECIAL EDUCATION NEEDS LIVING IN GREATER MANCHESTER IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Autastic Charity
273-277 Manchester Road East
Little Hulton
MANCHESTER
M38 9AW
- Phone:
- 07984085194
- Email:
- theautasticcharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window