ROTHERHAM & DISTRICT MENCAP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 September 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rotherham
Governance
- 16 September 1981: Standard registration
- 22 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- M E N C A P (Working name)
- ROTHERHAM AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/09/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 07 September 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH JUNE 1981 AS AMENDED 14TH JULY 2003
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE ROTHERHAM AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window