Financial history BLANKETS FOR BABY RHINOS

Charity number: 1179773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.44k £17.97k £18.12k £19.61k £18.88k
Total expenditure £18.60k £15.83k £16.92k £17.84k £20.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A