DURHAM DISTRICT RETIRED GREYHOUNDS

Charity number: 1178882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Seek potential adoption homes for retired racing greyhounds. Educate the public in the husbandary and care of former racing greyhounds.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £44,089
Total expenditure: £42,256

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNN ROCHESTER Chair 01 June 2018
None on record
ANDREW D MYERS Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
KATHERINE HUTCHINSON Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £21.18k £24.87k £56.95k £55.63k £44.09k
Total expenditure £20.39k £18.49k £59.34k £49.27k £42.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 27 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 21 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 21 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 19 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 28 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 28 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 The Green
Frosterley
BISHOP AUCKLAND
DL13 2RE
Phone:
07787751889