TONBRIDGE ATHLETIC CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purpose of the club is the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the public benefit and the benefit of the inhabitants of Tonbridge and Malling and the surrounding area by the provision of facilities for athletics and athletics related activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 16 April 2018: CIO registration
- TAC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Andrew Pitcairn-Knowles | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Charles Taylor | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Anne Emm | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Grazia Manzotti | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Peter Fagg | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.85k | £59.06k | £54.85k | £84.58k | £85.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.07k | £31.46k | £30.56k | £63.92k | £73.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TONBRIDGE AND MALLING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ATHLETICS AND ATHLETICS RELATED ACTIVITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE TONBRIDGE SCHOOL CENTRE
LONDON ROAD
TONBRIDGE
TN10 3AD
- Phone:
- 07541724690
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window