Financial history LORDSHILL YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1177775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £65.95k £59.90k £17.71k £67.19k £125.89k
Total expenditure £57.30k £30.08k £49.66k £49.92k £57.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.81k N/A