OVERPOOL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 511818
Charity reporting is overdue by 1201 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Community Association who manage community centre for the benefit of residents in the Overpool and surrounding areas. community rooms are available for hire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020

Total income: £5,954
Total expenditure: £4,212

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 March 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHYLLIS KEWN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.98k £6.74k £4.19k £4.93k £5.95k
Total expenditure £4.98k £6.74k £4.19k £4.93k £4.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1201 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1201 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 April 2021 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Overpool Community Association
3 Bostock Green
Ellesmere Port
CH65 8HX
Phone:
01513550965
Website:

No information available