Financial history PILGRIMS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1178501
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £52.46k £37.44k £54.78k £45.31k £70.68k
Total expenditure £40.61k £35.48k £52.13k £41.22k £70.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A