Accounts and annual returns NUESTRA ESCUELA LEEDS

Charity number: 1180223
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 01 June 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 01 June 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 14 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 26 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 20 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window