NUESTRA ESCUELA LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance theeducation of the public in Leeds and thesurrounding areas in the Spanish language, culture and traditions by providingSpanish language classes and organising activities and events to educate the public in the culture and traditions of Spain andSpanish speakingcountries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £2,277 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 08 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUAN MIGUEL AVILA ZARAGOZA | Chair | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cristina Martinez-Conde Gomez | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jose Carlos Cantero Carralero | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria del Rosario Gonzalez Capilla | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juan Victor Garcia Gil | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marco Felipe King | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Marquez Mezquita | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debora Capell Terwisscha | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNA DE BOLOS PRAT | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
YOLANDA PEREZ FERNANDEZ | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.28k | £22.99k | £10.98k | £34.87k | £35.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.92k | £17.87k | £16.05k | £34.58k | £35.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.80k | £2.50k | £1.50k | £4.03k | £2.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 June 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 01 June 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN LEEDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE SPANISH LANGUAGE, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS BY PROVIDING SPANISH LANGUAGE CLASSES AND ORGANISING ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTURE AND TRADITIONS OF SPAIN AND SPANISH SPEAKING COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Century House
1275 Century Way
Thorpe Par
Leeds
LS15 8ZB
- Phone:
- 07473656966
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window