NORTH WALSHAM COMMUNITY SHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Trust are to make grants and to support charities and voluntary organisations that; -help disadvantaged groups in the town and local area to help them meet their needs and participate more fully in society and to promote equality and diversity -help projects and groups improve the public environment to enhance the quality of life for all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £373 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 June 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Alexandra Ellis | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Velhagen | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Jade Mayes | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Jordan | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Wright | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Abbs | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Cooke | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JON WITTE | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WRIGHT | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.75k | £38.63k | £65.49k | £64.14k | £65.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.19k | £31.33k | £48.29k | £47.05k | £52.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £22.48k | £563 | £373 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 JUN 2018 as amended on 07 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF NORTH WALSHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. 2) TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND GUIDANCE TO RECEIPIENTS OF OUR GRANTS TO ESTABLISH GOOD ADMINISTRATIVE PRACTICES (I.E BANKING AND PROPERTY TRANSACTIONS). FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE: ? CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. ? VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 YARMOUTH ROAD
NORTH WALSHAM
NR28 9AU
- Phone:
- 01692500972
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window