DOVECOTE FARM RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
People with disabilities are given the opportunity to ride horses or ponies to benefit their health and wellbeing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 23 March 2018: CIO registration
- DOVECOTE FARM GROUP (Working name)
- DOVECOTE FARM RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Elizabeth Watson | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Muscott | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Jane Fogg | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Emma Clayton | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER GUNN | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE PARNHAM | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.80k | £0 | £1.58k | £7.13k | £4.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.04k | £527 | £4.41k | £4.79k | £4.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL-BEING IN THE NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dovecote Farm RDA
Dovecote Farm Equestrian Centre
Church Street
Orston
Notts
NG13 9NS
- Phone:
- 07835 085773
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window