WORCESTERSHIRE CHURCHES SUPPORTING ADOPTION AND FOSTERING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOME FOR GOOD: WORCESTERSHIRE EXISTS TO ENCOURAGE PEOPLE TO FOSTER AND ADOPT, TO SUPPORT FAMILIES THAT FOSTER AND ADOPT, AND TO INSPIRE AND EQUIP CHURCHES TO WELCOME AND SUPPORT SUCH FAMILIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 11 April 2018: CIO registration
- HOME FOR GOOD: WORCESTERSHIRE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Watkins | Chair | 20 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Alison Lloyd | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Price | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joy Pollock | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS ROSE PARKER | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.72k | £1.76k | £10.53k | £6.37k | £4.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.71k | £2.71k | £3.80k | £5.85k | £5.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AS SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND ADVANCE IN LIFE CHILDREN WHO HAVE BEEN, OR MAY BE, ADOPTED, FOSTERED OR PLACED IN CARE INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) ENCOURAGING CHRISTIANS TO ADOPT AND/OR FOSTER VULNERABLE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, EQUIPPING CHURCHES TO SUPPORT FOSTER CARERS AND ADOPTIVE FAMILIES AND EQUIPPING LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND FOSTERING/ADOPTION AGENCIES TO ENGAGE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH CHURCHES AND CHRISTIANS AND CONNECTING FAMILIES WHO FOSTER OR ADOPT FOR BEFRIENDING AND SUPPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BATTENHALL ROAD
WORCESTER
WR5 2BJ
- Phone:
- 07926572275
- Email:
- stuartwatkins2018@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window