VIETNAMESE FAMILY PARTNERSHIP (GIA DINH VIET)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to support the Vietnamese community in Lewisham and neighbouring boroughs. Specifically, we: Relieve poverty by helping people to access service, training and employment Provide supplementary education for children and adults Relieve sickness and promote health Advance knowledge and understanding of Vietnamese language, culture, history and heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,800 from 2 government contract(s) and £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 28 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thi Thu Huyen Le | Chair | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yuk Cheng Tran | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Quynhnhu Nguyen | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andy Quach | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tung Nguyen | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
THOAI NHU NGUYEN | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.80k | £36.37k | £51.97k | £54.94k | £84.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.24k | £21.98k | £34.20k | £46.36k | £67.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.80k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.80k | £6.00k | £35.16k | £7.00k | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN LEWISHAM AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS: 1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PEOPLE OF VIETNAMESE HERITAGE BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ADVOCACY TO HELP THEM ACCESS RESOURCES, SERVICES, EMPLOYMENT, TRAINING AND OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVIDING SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULT EDUCATION CLASSES. 3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND WELLBEING, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF PEOPLE OF VIETNAMESE HERITAGE BY PROVIDING WORKSHOPS AND ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON NUTRITION, EXERCISE AND HEALTH. 4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN VIETNAMESE LANGUAGE, CULTURE, HISTORY AND HERITAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Evelyn Community Centre
1 Kingfisher Square
LONDON
SE8 5TW
- Phone:
- 07543241425
- Email:
- londonvietschool@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window