THE DEVENISH BRADSHAW CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
N/A
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,946 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 04 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Charles Allnutt | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eloise Melissa Fellows | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Dawn Phillips | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Joanne Standish | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret Alison Sims | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Gill | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BURTON | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.50k | £15.00k | £31.94k | £16.08k | £53.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £488 | £5.38k | £36.77k | £18.41k | £8.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £23.22k | £13.22k | £8.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 04 APR 2018 AMENDED ON 12 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- (1) TO PRESERVE, CONSERVE AND PROTECT THE LAND KNOWN AS THE WATER MEADOWS, IN LAVERSTOCK ("THE WATER MEADOWS"), AND ITS CHALK VALLEY RIVERINE HABITATS; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE COMMUNITY IN LAVERSTOCK AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE AND ENVIRONMENTALLY-BASED EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS CONCERNING THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE WATER MEADOWS; (3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE INTEREST OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE; (4) TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE OR CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 12 Manor Road
SALISBURY
SP1 1JS
- Phone:
- 07427942195
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window