Accounts and annual returns UNITED HANDS

Charity Number: 1179489
Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days
Annual return 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days