Financial history THE SOCIETY OF ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE

Charity number: 1177459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.65m £1.02m £1.24m £1.43m £1.81m
Total expenditure £1.56m £1.38m £1.61m £1.71m £2.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.33k £28.87k N/A N/A £85.39k
Income - Donations and legacies £492.35k £215.37k £239.31k £178.20k £456.62k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £87.46k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £865.76k £663.45k £575.25k £806.33k £637.25k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £29.87k £22.83k £26.27k £34.82k £29.89k
Income - Other £264.89k £29.46k £398.46k £411.12k £687.64k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.46m £1.32m £1.49m £1.58m £1.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £92.62k £54.01k £22.56k £19.60k £157.60k
Expenditure - Governance £6.95k £7.25k £8.06k £8.66k £9.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £91.80k £111.03k £0