THE SOCIETY OF ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE

Charity number: 1177459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Stephen's House is an Anglican Theological College and Permanent Private Hall of the University of Oxford offering formation, education and training for a variety of qualifications and ministries. St Stephen's House also hosts summer school and seminars and acts as a centre for sabbaticals and retreats. Its grade I listed church is also let as a venue for concerts and other musical events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 February 1963: Standard registration
  • 03 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ewan Gillings Trustee 06 February 2024
None on record
Rev Andreas Wenzel Trustee 23 October 2023
None on record
The Reverend Grant Lambert Naylor Trustee 23 October 2023
ST MATTHEW'S HOUSE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SHEFFIELD ST MATTHEW
Received: On time
FELLOWSHIP OF ST JOHN (UK) TRUST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ADDITIONAL CURATES SOCIETY
Received: On time
Katie Harrison Trustee 08 March 2023
CENTRE FOR CULTURAL WITNESS
Received: On time
Morag Ellis KC Trustee 08 March 2023
None on record
Edward Dobson Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
Rev Lucy Gardner Trustee 28 October 2021
None on record
REVEREND CANON PAUL RICHARD ARMSTEAD Trustee 20 September 2018
None on record
THE REVD CANON DR ROBIN WARD Trustee 20 September 2018
None on record
The Right Reverend Dr Martin Clive Warner Trustee 20 September 2018
THE ECCLESIASTICAL LAW SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE JOHN BOOTH CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MOTHER AGNES TRUST
Received: On time
BISHOP OTTER TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN FUND AND BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
RIGHT REVEREND JONATHAN MARK RICHARD BAKER Trustee 20 September 2018
LADY ELIZABETH HATTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
PARISH ESTATES CHARITY
Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
BROMFIELD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FORWARD IN FAITH
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN CHURCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ASCOT PRIORY
Received: On time
JOHN DAVID SEBASTIAN BOOTH Trustee 20 September 2018
THE JOHN BOOTH CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ASCOT PRIORY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.65m £1.02m £1.24m £1.43m £1.81m
Total expenditure £1.56m £1.38m £1.61m £1.71m £2.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.33k £28.87k N/A N/A £85.39k
Income - Donations and legacies £492.35k £215.37k £239.31k £178.20k £456.62k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £87.46k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £865.76k £663.45k £575.25k £806.33k £637.25k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £29.87k £22.83k £26.27k £34.82k £29.89k
Income - Other £264.89k £29.46k £398.46k £411.12k £687.64k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.46m £1.32m £1.49m £1.58m £1.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £92.62k £54.01k £22.56k £19.60k £157.60k
Expenditure - Governance £6.95k £7.25k £8.06k £8.66k £9.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £91.80k £111.03k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £17.54m £17.64m £17.43m £17.20m £12.27m
Long-term investments £1.43m £1.52m £1.50m £1.47m £5.04m
Other assets £718.76k £641.37k £620.01k £607.07k £479.87k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£221.04k -£201.65k -£303.58k -£1.95k £0
Total liabilities £2.06m £3.17m £3.36m £3.40m £3.12m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 15 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 13 May 2021 13 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MINUTE OF MEETING OF 28 OCTOBER 1915
Charitable objects
A PRIZE FOR LITURGIOLOGY TO BE AWARDED ANNUALLY TO MEMBERS OF THE HOUSE OR PRIESTS WHO HAVE FORMERLY BEEN MEMBERS OF THE HOUSE, AND ALSO HAVE NOT COMPLETED FIVE YEARS SINCE THEIR ORDINATION TO THE PRIESTHOOD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 13 February 1963 : Standard registration
  • 03 July 2018 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
ST. STEPHENS HOUSE
16 MARSTON STREET
OXFORD
OX4 1JX
Phone:
01865613500