FORGET ME NOT MEMORY CAFÉ CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stimulating cognitive & various physical activities for those have any memory issues, depressions or facing loneliness and their carers. Our services include various mind stimulating creative and practical activities and projects at different settings, such as in hospitals, care home, libraries etc. as well as outreach, help, advice, information & signposting to other health professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,520 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
800 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- Newham
- Sutton
Governance
- 30 May 2018: Standard registration
- FORGET ME NOT MEMORY CAFÉ (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Florence Nosayaba Ejemai | Chair | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vikas Kesarwani | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Shaw | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Mcdonald | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.15k | £64.16k | £79.01k | £75.06k | £96.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.76k | £68.30k | £77.38k | £63.52k | £78.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.15k | N/A | £13.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS BY PROVIDING ACTIVITIES FOR COGNITIVE STIMULATION AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thomas Wall Centre
52 Benhill Avenue
SUTTON
Surrey
SM1 4DP
- Phone:
- 07815688335
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window