LIFE FESTIVAL ENTERPRISE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Life Festival Enterprise organises free-of-charge public festivals open to all, in partnership with local churches, and celebrates cultures in local communities to foster unity between people from diverse backgrounds, and communicate God's unconditional love as all embracing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 April 2018: CIO registration
- 07 April 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 07 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1180743 GRATITUDE INITIATIVE
- LIFE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.42k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.76k | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF LIFE ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ORGANISING FREE-OF-CHARGE PUBLIC FESTIVALS OPEN TO ALL, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH LOCAL CHURCHES, NATIVE AS WELL AS DIASPORA, AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES. 2) TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY CELEBRATING THE MOSAIC OF MUSIC, FOODS AND DRESS IN LOCAL COMMUNITIES, PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNITY BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS, AND COMMUNICATING GODÆS UNCONDITIONAL LOVE AS ALL EMBRACING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window