Accounts and annual returns NELSON GARDEN

Charity Number: 1177651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 08 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 September 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required