NELSON GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Nelson Garden in Monmouth is located behind Monnow Street and can be accessed by a footpath from Monnow Street Car Park. Volunteer gardeners maintain the Garden on a weekly basis between March and November and it is open to the public three times a week during the summer. A committee organise fund-raising events throughout the year. The Nelson Garden is available for hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 22 March 2018: Standard registration
- NELSON GARDEN PRESERVATION TRUST (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Steven Palfrey Bailey B.Sc Econ | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louis Roeder BA | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jean Atkins | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Caroline Jenkins | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Yardley BScHons | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Miles | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Amos Dip HE | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60k | £836 | £4.57k | £1.72k | £2.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.32k | £920 | £2.55k | £2.04k | £3.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO CONSERVE, ENHANCE AND PROMOTE THE NELSON GARDEN A UNIQUE HISTORIC ASSET AND AMENITY FOR THE TOWN OF MONMOUTH AND THE LOCAL AREA; TO ENCOURAGE APPROPRIATE USE AND ENJOYMENT OF THE NELSON GARDEN BE RESIDENTS OF AND VISITORS TO THE TOWN OF MONMOUTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
High Glannau Manor
Lydart
Monmouth
NP25 4AD
- Phone:
- 01600860005
- Email:
- ngpt1802@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
nelsongarden.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window