Financial history THE JOHN MCAVOY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1178479
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023
Total gross income £6.53k £800 £500 £150.00k £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £40.36k £152.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A