REVELATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion mainly, but not exclusively, by means of broadcasting Christian messages of an evangelistic and teaching nature. To advance the Christian religion in for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Taylor | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elijah Kirby | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Morolari Opeoluwa Hayden | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Addis | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.48k | £95.09k | £185.01k | £214.97k | £203.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.00k | £32.57k | £92.52k | £123.13k | £140.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Revelation Trust GE
PO Box 7082
RUGBY
Warwickshire
CV21 9WD
- Phone:
- 07720550634
- Email:
- admin@revelationtrust.org
- Website:
-
revelationtrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window