EVIE'S GIFT CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the families of critically-ill children who are many miles from home in regional childrens hospitals. We provide local hotel accommodation and immediate financial assistance to those that need it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRYAN JOHN CLOVER | Chair | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Marie Eve Vickers | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saskia Jane Jordan | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neesha Umakant Patel | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon David William Hopkins | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Cordon GLCM LLCM | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAWN MARGARET JACKSON | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH MARY GATES | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CRANE | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.96k | £73.57k | £57.32k | £66.72k | £76.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.38k | £36.46k | £59.81k | £94.97k | £73.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO THE FAMILIES OF CHILDREN WITH LIFE-LIMITING AND LIFE-SHORTENING CONDITIONS AND BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO BRAIN CANCER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Farmhouse Court
Melksham
SN12 6FG
- Phone:
- 07939541289
- Email:
- info@eviesgift.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window