ABERYSTWYTH POLISH COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AberPCC leads the development of a local Polish community, works to sustain bilingualism within local younger generation and promotes Polish intangible cultural heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 14 August 2018: CIO registration
- 07 July 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- 07 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1168220 PENPARCAU COMMUNITY FORUM LTD
- ABER PCC (Working name)
- ABERYSTWYTH PCC (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/08/2019 | 14/08/2020 | 14/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.20k | £916 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.71k | £2.75k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 August 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 August 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 14 August 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 August 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 14 August 2019 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 August 2019 | 31 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE POLISH PEOPLE OF ABERYSTWYTH AND SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, ETHNIC ORIGIN, AGE, DISABILITY, ILL HEALTH, POVERTY OR OTHER OPINIONS. TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL, LEISURE AND INTERACTIVE PROGRAMMES AND IN PARTICULAR THE CREATIVE POLISH WORKSHOPS. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window