Financial history WESTON TURVILLE U3A

Charity number: 1177790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.16k £3.73k £16.49k £30.21k £35.09k
Total expenditure £33.97k £4.09k £16.87k £32.37k £34.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A