CLEAN INC. FOUNDATION CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 August 2018: CIO registration
- CLEAN INC. FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES ARDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LEWIS ARDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE CIO’S OBJECTS ARE, IN RELATION TO PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING, PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY, WITHIN THE 10 BOROUGHS OF GREATER MANCHESTER, AS FOLLOWS: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING GOODS (INCLUDING FOOD AND CLOTHING) AND/OR USE OF FACILITIES AND/OR SERVICES ANY OF WHICH PERSONS COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS AND IN PARTICULAR: A. BY THE PROVISION OF CLOTHING TO THE DESTITUTE AND/OR HOMELESS; B. BY SUPPORTING OTHERS TO ACHIEVE THESE OBJECTS, SUCH AS BY MAKING GRANTS TO CHARITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 VILLAGE SQUARE, BRAMHALL CENTRE
22 THE BRAMHALL CENTRE
BRAMHALL
STOCKPORT
SK7 1AW
- Phone:
- 01614400131
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window