Financial history HORSHAM & SHIPLEY COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity Number: 1178797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £96.30k £35.01k £41.97k £31.77k £15.30k
Total expenditure £20.67k £15.01k £13.63k £19.05k £21.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A