FRIENDS OF RONALD ROSS PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1177474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We raise money for children at Ronald Ross Primary School, for example through winter and summer fairs, charity donations for residential trips, working with families of children at school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £92
Total expenditure: £1,225

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 March 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SARAH WHEATLEY Chair 08 March 2018
None on record
Eleanor Mary Mann Trustee 19 November 2024
None on record
BRINDER BAINS Trustee 08 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.15k £59 £3.07k £5.23k £92
Total expenditure £280 £100 £1.66k £1.05k £1.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RONALD ROSS PRIMARY SCHOOL
145 BEAUMONT ROAD
LONDON
SW19 6RY
Phone:
02087885233