SOLVA EDGE FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To promote the arts, heritage and culture for the benefit of the public, the charity organises an annual community led arts and culture festival (The Edge Festival). 2. To advance education the Festival provides a number of educational workshops on such subjects as dance, architecture, culture and heritage. 3. Supporting general charitable purposes and young people by making grants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 02 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Edward Chapman | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Patricia Mary Chapman | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arwyn Meurig Jenkins | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.80k | £5.03k | £15.24k | £68.53k | £70.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.62k | £842 | £4.70k | £71.65k | £65.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £13.38k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS, HERITAGE AND CULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) MUSICAL, LITERARY, DRAMATIC, PERFORMANCE, DANCE AND VISUAL ARTS PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY ORGANISING AND DELIVERING ARTS AND CULTURAL FESTIVALS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HERITAGE, CULTURE AND THE ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR MUSICAL, LITERATURE, POETRY, HISTORY AND VISUAL ARTS PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH WORKSHOPS, TALKS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AT OR IN CONNECTION WITH ARTS AND CULTURAL FESTIVALS. TO SUPPORT SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOUGH ADVANCEMENT OF THEIR EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Maes Maelgwyn
Whitchurch
Solva
HAVERFORDWEST
Dyfed
SA62 6US
- Phone:
- 07774 111003
- Email:
- info@edgefestival.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window